Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Bagenal, Beauchamp'Mr Bagnal' Active in Session(s): 1781 |
[0071] |
|
Bagwell, John Active in Session(s): 1763, 1765, 1767 |
[0073] |
|
Bagwell, John Active in Session(s): 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A, 1796B |
[0074] |
|
Ball, John Active in Session(s): 1796B, 1798 |
[0082] |
|
Barrington, Jonah Active in Session(s): 1792, 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A |
[0087] |
|
Barry, –'Mr Barry' This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0091 0092 |
[6005] |
|
Barry, –'Colonel Barry' Active in Session(s): 1799, 1800 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1375 1376 |
[6006] |
|
Barry, James Active in Session(s): 1709, 1715 |
[0091] |
|
Barry, James |
[0092] |
|
Barry, James |
[0094] |
|
Barry, James Active in Session(s): 1710 3rd Earl of Barrymore (succeeded 17 Apr. 1699; sworn in House of Lords 14 Feb. 1704) |
[4007] |
|
Bateman, Rowland Active in Session(s): 1767 |
[0100] |
|
Beauchamp, John Active in Session(s): 1727, 1729 |
[0103] |
|
Bellew, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1723 |
[0108] |
|
Bennet, William Active in Session(s): 1792 Bishop of Cork (13 June 1790 to 27 June 1794) |
[3034] |
|
Bennett, John Active in Session(s): 1775, 1783 |
[0112] |
|
Beresford, –'Right Hon. Mr Beresford' Active in Session(s): 1783, 1785, 1786, 1789 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0115 0119 |
[6009] |
|
Beresford, –'Mr Beresford' Active in Session(s): 1795, 1796A, 1796B This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0114 0115 0117 0119 |
[6113] |
|
Beresford, – |
[6137] |
|
Beresford, George de la Poer Active in Session(s): 1777 8th Earl of Tyrone (succeeded 4 Apr. 1763) |
[0113] |
|
Beresford, Henry de la Poer Active in Session(s): 1789, 1796A Styled Earl of Tyrone (1789 to 1800) |
[0114] |
|
Beresford, John'Hon. Mr Beresford; Right Hon. John Beresford; Right Hon. Mr Beresford; Mr John Beresford' Active in Session(s): 1763, 1769, 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1781, 1790A, 1792, 1794, 1796B, 1798, 1800 |
[0115] |
|
Beresford, John Claudius Active in Session(s): 1791, 1792, 1793, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 |
[0117] |
|
Beresford, Marcus'Mr Beresford; Marcus Beresford' Active in Session(s): 1783, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1788, 1789, 1790A, 1795, 1796A, 1796B |
[0119] |
|
Beresford, Marcus |
[0120] |
|
Beresford, Marcus'Marcus Beresford' Active in Session(s): 1791, 1792, 1793, 1794 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0119 0120 |
[6008] |
|
Beresford, William Active in Session(s): 1792 Bishop of Ossory (21 May 1782 to 10 Oct. 1794) |
[3029] |
|
Bernard, Francis Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697, 1698, 1707, 1709, 1719 |
[0124] |
|
Bettesworth, Richard Active in Session(s): 1723, 1725, 1729, 1731, 1733, 1735, 1737, 1739 Second Serjeant (22 Apr. 1732 to 20 Jan. 1741) |
[0130] |
|
Bindon, David Active in Session(s): 1733, 1735, 1739, 1741, 1745, 1747 |
[0132] |
|
Bindon, Samuel Active in Session(s): 1729 |
[0133] |
|
Bingham, –'Mr Bingham' Active in Session(s): 1715 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0136 0140 |
[6010] |
|
Bingham, Charles Active in Session(s): 1767, 1771B |
[0134] |
|
Bingham, Henry |
[0136] |
|
Bingham, Henry Active in Session(s): 1761 |
[0138] |
|
Bingham, John |
[0140] |
|
Bingham, John Active in Session(s): 1727, 1733, 1743 |
[0141] |
|
Blackwood, James Stevenson Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0147] |
|
Blackwood, John Active in Session(s): 1767 |
[0148] |
|
Blakeney, Robert Active in Session(s): 1723 |
[0156] |
|
Blaquiere, John Active in Session(s): 1773, 1775, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1796B Chief Secretary (30 Nov. 1772 to 12 Dec. 1774) |
[0162] |
|
Blennerhasset, –'Mr Blennerhasset' Active in Session(s): 1695 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0166 0170 |
[6011] |
|
Blennerhasset, –'Mr Blennerhasset' Active in Session(s): 1709, 1710 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0167 0170 |
[6012] |
|
Blennerhasset, –'Mr Hassett' Active in Session(s): 1705 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0166 0170 |
[6014] |
|
Blennerhassett, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1729, 1731, 1733, 1735, 1737 |
[0163] |
|
Blennerhassett, John |
[0166] |
|
Blennerhassett, John |
[0167] |
|
Blennerhassett, Robert |
[0170] |
|
Bligh, Edward Active in Session(s): 1737 2nd Earl of Darnley (succeeded 12 Sept. 1728; sworn in House of Lords 4 Oct. 1737) |
[4004] |
|
Bligh, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1703 |
[0174] |
|
Blundell, Francis Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697, 1698, 1703, 1705 |
[0177] |
|
Bolton, Cornelius Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1788, 1790A |
[0181] |
|
Bolton, Theophilus Active in Session(s): 1723, 1727, 1743 Bishop of Clonfert (30 Sept. 1722 to 16 Apr. 1724); Bishop of Elphin (16 Apr. 1724 to 6 Jan. 1730); Archbishop of Cashel (6 Jan. 1730 to 31 Jan. 1744) |
[3007] |
|
Boulter, Hugh Active in Session(s): 1725, 1727, 1729, 1731, 1735 Archbishop of Armagh (31 Aug. 1724 to 27 Sept. 1742) |
[3002] |
|
Bourke, –'Mr Bourke' Active in Session(s): 1737 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0191 0192 |
[6015] |
|
Bourke, Dominick |
[0191] |
|
Bourke, John Active in Session(s): 1737, 1739, 1741, 1745, 1747, 1749, 1751, 1757 |
[0192] |
|
Bourke, John'Mr Bourke' Active in Session(s): 1763, 1769, 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1777, 1779, 1783, 1785 |
[0193] |
|
Bourke, John Active in Session(s): 1799, 1800 Styled Lord Naas (1792-1794); 4th Earl of Mayo (succeeded 17 Aug. 1794) |
[0194] |
|
Bowes, John Active in Session(s): 1759, 1763, 1765 Lord Chancellor (22 Mar. 1757 to d. 22 July 1767) |
[0196] |
|
Boyd, Hugh Active in Session(s): 1794, 1795 |
[0197] |
|
Boyd, Robert Active in Session(s): 1785, 1787, 1790A |
[0199] |
|
Boyle, (Styled 1771 to 1807) Viscount |
[0211] |
|
Boyle, Charles Active in Session(s): 1695 2nd Earl of Burlington; Viscount Dungarvan; ? Earl of Cork (succeeded as [2nd] Viscount Dungarvan 12 Oct. 1694); Lord Treasurer 1695 to death (from 4 May 1695, acc. to Liber munerum, vol. i., part 2, p. 42; from 16 Nov., acc. to G.E.C., sub Burlington). |
[4065] |
|
Boyle, Henry Active in Session(s): 1737 Chancellor of Exchequer (19 Nov. 1733 to 5 Oct. 1735; 11 Apr. 1739 to 25 Apr. 1754; 3 Nov. 1755 to 9 Sept. 1757) |
[0210] |
|
Boyle, Henry Active in Session(s): 1798, 1799 Styled Viscount Boyle (1771 to 1807) |
[0211] |
|
Boyle, Murrough Active in Session(s): 1695, 1707, 1709 1st Viscount Blessington (created 23 Aug. 1673; sworn in House of Lords 5 Oct. 1692) |
[4009] |
|
Boyle, Richard Active in Session(s): 1751, 1753 |
[0213] |
|
Bradstreet, Samuel Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779, 1781, 1783 Recorder of Dublin (14 July 1766 to 1784) |
[0227] |
|
Brewster, Francis Active in Session(s): 1697 |
[0231] |
|
Brodrick, –'Mr Brodrick' Active in Session(s): 1698 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0237 0243 |
[6016] |
|
Brodrick, –'Mr Brodrick' Active in Session(s): 1703, 1707 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0237 0241 0243 |
[6017] |
|
Brodrick, –'Mr Brodrick' Active in Session(s): 1709, 1713 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0237 0242 0243 |
[6018] |
|
Brodrick, Alan Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697, 1698, 1715, 1725 Solicitor General (6 June 1695 to 14 Apr. 1704); Lord Chancellor (11 Oct. 1714 to 22 July 1725) |
[0237] |
|
Brodrick, St John |
[0241] |
|
Brodrick, St John Active in Session(s): 1695, 1698, 1710, 1711, 1715, 1717, 1723 |
[0242] |
|
Brodrick, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697, 1698 |
[0243] |
|
Brodrick, William Active in Session(s): 1717, 1721 Second Serjeant (1724 to 1728) |
[0246] |
|
Brooke, Henry Vaughan Active in Session(s): 1791 |
[0249] |
|
Browne, –'Mr Browne' Active in Session(s): 1798 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0252 0253 |
[6140] |
|
Browne, Arthur'Mr Browne, Dr Browne' Active in Session(s): 1789, 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1799 |
[0252] |
|
Browne, Denis'Hon. Mr Browne' Active in Session(s): 1792, 1793, 1798, 1799 |
[0253] |
|
Browne, James Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1775, 1777 Prime Serjeant (21 May 1784 to 21 June 1787) |
[0256] |
|
Browne, John Denis 3rd Earl of Altamont (succeeded 28 Dec. 1780; sworn in House of Lords 22 Nov. 1781) |
[0260] |
|
Brownlow, William Active in Session(s): 1757, 1761, 1765, 1767, 1771A, 1789, 1791 |
[0265] |
|
Bulkeley, Richard Active in Session(s): 1697, 1698, 1703 |
[0272] |
|
Bunbury, Walter Active in Session(s): 1705, 1707, 1709 |
[0274] |
|
Burgh, –'Mr Burgh' This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0283 0284 |
[6021] |
|
Burgh, Richard |
[0279] |
|
Burgh, Thomas |
[0281] |
|
Burgh, Thomas |
[0282] |
|
Burgh, Thomas'Mr Burgh of Oldtown' Active in Session(s): 1777, 1783 |
[0283] |
|
Burgh, Thomas'Mr Burgh, Accountant General' Active in Session(s): 1786, 1789, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1795, 1796A, 1798 |
[0284] |
|
Burgh, Thomas'Mr Thomas Burgh' Active in Session(s): 1735 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0281 0282 |
[6019] |
|
Burgh, Thomas'Mr Thomas Burgh' Active in Session(s): 1781, 1783, 1789, 1790A This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0283 0284 |
[6020] |
|
Burgh, William Active in Session(s): 1771B |
[0286] |
|
Burton, –'Mr Burton' Active in Session(s): 1733 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0297 0300 0301 |
[6022] |
|
Burton, –'Colonel Burton' Active in Session(s): 1771A, 1771B, 1773, 1775 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0299 0303 0304 |
[6024] |
|
Burton, –'Colonel Burton' Active in Session(s): 1779 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0299 0304 |
[6025] |
|
Burton, –'Alderman Burton' Active in Session(s): 1749 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0293 0295 0300 |
[6115] |
|
Burton, –'Alderman Burton' Active in Session(s): 1729, 1731 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0297 0300 0301 |
[6141] |
|
Burton, –'Mr Burton' Active in Session(s): 1775 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0299 0303 0304 |
[6142] |
|
Burton, Benjamin Active in Session(s): 1707 Lord Mayor of Dublin ([29 Sept.] 1706 to [28 Sept.] 1707) |
[0292] |
|
Burton, Benjamin Active in Session(s): 1749 |
[0293] |
|
Burton, Charles Active in Session(s): 1749, 1757, 1759 |
[0295] |
|
Burton, Francis Active in Session(s): 1733, 1737 |
[0297] |
|
Burton, Robert |
[0300] |
|
Burton, Samuel Active in Session(s): 1727 |
[0301] |
|
Burton, William This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0303 0304 |
[6143] |
|
Burton, William Henry Active in Session(s): 1777 |
[0304] |
|
Burton (Conyngham), Francis Pierpoint |
[0299] |
|
Bush, –'Mr Bush' Active in Session(s): 1711 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0307 0308 |
[6026] |
|
Bushe, Amyas |
[0307] |
|
Bushe, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1703, 1711 |
[0308] |
|
Bushe, Charles Kendal Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0309] |
|
Bushe, Gervase Parker Active in Session(s): 1775, 1779, 1783 |
[0310] |
|
Busteed, Jephson Active in Session(s): 1717, 1719, 1721, 1723 |
[0311] |
|
Butler, Brinsley'Lord Newtown' Active in Session(s): 1751, 1755, 1757, 1759, 1761, 1765, 1773 Styled Lord Newtown-Butler (1756-68); 2nd Earl of Lanesborough (succeeded 11 Apr. 1768; sworn in House of Lords 3 May 1768) |
[0313] |
|
Butler, Edmund 11th Viscount Mountgarret (succeeded 9 Feb. 1779; sworn in House of Lords 26 Nov. 1779) |
[0314] |
|
Butler, Humphrey Active in Session(s): 1759 4th Viscount Lanesborough (succeeded 7 Mar. 1736; sworn in House of Lords 23 Mar. 1736); 1st Earl of Lanesborough (created 20 July 1756; 11 Oct. 1757) |
[0317] |
|
Butler, Pierce Active in Session(s): 1709, 1711 |
[0324] |
|
Butler, Somerset Hamilton Active in Session(s): 1759, 1763, 1765 8th Viscount Ikerrin (succeeded 20 Oct. 1721); 1st Earl of Carrick (created 10 June 1748) |
[4001] |
|
Butler, Theophilus'Lord Newtown' Active in Session(s): 1715, 1717 1st Baron Newtown-Butler (created 21 Oct. 1715; sworn in House of Lords 12 Nov. 1715) |
[0329] |
|
Butler, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1771B |
[0332] |
|
Butler (-Wandesford), John Active in Session(s): 1793 |
[0323] |
|
|