Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Daly, –'Mr Daly' Active in Session(s): 1775, 1779 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0568 0570 0571 |
[6035] |
|
Daly, –'Mr Daly' Active in Session(s): 1796A This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0571 0573 |
[6036] |
|
Daly, Anthony |
[0568] |
|
Daly, Denis Active in Session(s): 1773, 1779, 1789 |
[0570] |
|
Daly, Denis Bowes Active in Session(s): 1786, 1787, 1789, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1795, 1796A |
[0571] |
|
Daly, Peter |
[0573] |
|
Daly, St George Active in Session(s): 1798, 1800 Prime Serjeant (28 Jan. 1799 to 30 June 1801) |
[0574] |
|
Damer, George Active in Session(s): 1795 Styled Viscount Milton (1792-98) |
[0575] |
|
Damer, John Active in Session(s): 1763, 1771B, 1773, 1775 |
[0576] |
|
Darby, Henry Verney Lovett Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0578] |
|
Davys, Paul Active in Session(s): 1709 1st Viscount and Baron Mountcashel (created 31 1706; sworn in House of Lords 1 July 1707) |
[4041] |
|
Davys (alias Davis), John Active in Session(s): 1698 |
[0583] |
|
Dawson, –'Mr Dawson' Active in Session(s): 1781 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0585 0596 |
[6037] |
|
Dawson, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1735, 1737 |
[0584] |
|
Dawson, Arthur |
[0585] |
|
Dawson, John Active in Session(s): 1787, 1793, 1796B, 1798 ?2nd Viscount Carlow (succeeded 22 Aug. 1779; sworn in House of Lords 12 Oct. 1779); 1st Earl of Portarlington (created 21 June 1785; sworn in House of Lords 19 July 1785) |
[0589] |
|
Dawson, Richard Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0593] |
|
Dawson, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1763, 1767 |
[0595] |
|
Dawson, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1781 |
[0596] |
|
Day, Robert Active in Session(s): 1785, 1786, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A |
[0598] |
|
Deane, –'Mr Deane' Active in Session(s): 1703, 1705, 1707, 1709 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0599 0603 |
[6038] |
|
Deane, Edward Active in Session(s): 1695, 1709 |
[0599] |
|
Deane, Joseph Active in Session(s): 1703, 1709, 1710 |
[0603] |
|
Deane, Matthew Active in Session(s): 1743 |
[0607] |
|
Deane, Robert Active in Session(s): 1757, 1761, 1763 |
[0608] |
|
Deane, Robert Tilson'Sir Robert Tilson Deane' Active in Session(s): 1779 1st Baron Muskerry (of second creation; created 5 Jan. 1781; sworn in House of Lords 9 Oct. 1781) |
[0609] |
|
Dennis, James Active in Session(s): 1763, 1769, 1771B Second Serjeant (1767 to 17 July 1774); Prime Serjeant (18 July 1774 to 23 July 1777); Baron Tracton (created 4 Jan. 1781; sworn in House of Lords 30 Oct. 1781) |
[0613] |
|
Denny, Barry Active in Session(s): 1791 |
[0617] |
|
Digby, John Active in Session(s): 1739, 1741, 1747, 1751, 1753, 1755 |
[0630] |
|
Digby, Simon Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1777 |
[0631] |
|
Digby, Simon Bishop of Elphin (12 Jan. 1691 to 7 Apr. 1720) |
[3037] |
|
Dillon, –'Mr Dillon' Active in Session(s): 1777 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0635 0637 |
[6039] |
|
Dillon, John Talbot Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1773, 1779, 1781 |
[0635] |
|
Dillon, Robert Active in Session(s): 1785 |
[0637] |
|
Dillon-Lee, Charles Active in Session(s): 1795, 1796A, 1796B 12th Viscount Dillon of Costello-Gallen (succeeded 15 Sept. 1787) |
[4008] |
|
Dixon, Robert Active in Session(s): 1731 Second Serjeant (5 Jan. 1728 to d. 8 Feb. 1732) |
[0640] |
|
Dixon (alias Dickson), Hugh Active in Session(s): 1729, 1731, 1733, 1735 |
[0638] |
|
Dobbs, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1727, 1729, 1731, 1733, 1735, 1737, 1739, 1751 |
[0641] |
|
Donnellan, Nehemiah Active in Session(s): 1739, 1743 |
[0653] |
|
Dopping, Samuel Active in Session(s): 1705, 1707, 1717 |
[0655] |
|
Downes, Dive Active in Session(s): 1707, 1709 Bishop of Cork (4 June 1699 to 13 Nov. 1709) |
[3032] |
|
Downes, Robert Active in Session(s): 1743, 1745, 1749 |
[0657] |
|
Doyle, John Active in Session(s): 1791, 1795 |
[0659] |
|
Duigenan, Patrick Active in Session(s): 1791, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 |
[0664] |
|
Dunn, John Active in Session(s): 1785 |
[0672] |
|
|