Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Falkiner, Frederick John Active in Session(s): 1799, 1800 |
[0718] |
|
Fitzgerald, –'Right Hon. Mr Fitzgerald' Active in Session(s): 1799, 1800 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0728 0735 0739 |
[6044] |
|
Fitzgerald, –'Mr Fitzgerald' Active in Session(s): 1775 |
[6045] |
|
Fitzgerald, –'Mr Fitzgerald' Active in Session(s): 1705 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0742 0743 |
[6131] |
|
Fitzgerald, James Active in Session(s): 1747, 1769, 1771A, 1771B, 1773 20th Earl of Kildare (succeeded 20 Feb. 1744); 1st Earl of Offaly and 1st Marquess of Kildare (created 3 Mar. 1761; sworn in House of Lords 10 Dec. 1761); 1st Duke of Leinster (created 26 Nov. 1766; sworn in House of Lords 27 Jan. 1768) |
[0734] |
|
Fitzgerald, James Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779, 1783, 1790A, 1791, 1793, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1800 Third Serjeant (8 May 1779 to 1782); Second Serjeant (8 Apr. 1784 to 20 June 1787); Prime Serjeant (21 June 1787 to 27 Jan. 1799) |
[0735] |
|
Fitzgerald, Lord Charles James |
[0728] |
|
Fitzgerald, Maurice |
[0738] |
|
Fitzgerald, Maurice Active in Session(s): 1798 |
[0739] |
|
Fitzgerald, Richard Active in Session(s): 1763 |
[0740] |
|
Fitzgerald, Robert |
[0742] |
|
Fitzgerald, Robert |
[0743] |
|
Fitzgerald, Robert Active in Session(s): 1747, 1751, 1753, 1755, 1757, 1759, 1761, 1763, 1765, 1767, 1771A, 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1777, 1779, 17 |
[0744] |
|
Fitzgerald, Robert Active in Session(s): 1709, 1727 19th Earl of Kildare (succeeded 9 Nov. 1707; sworn in House of Lords 5 May 1709) |
[4032] |
|
Fitzgerald, William Active in Session(s): 1703 Bishop of Clonfert (26 July 1691 to 1722) |
[3031] |
|
Fitzgerald, William Robert'Marquis of Kildare' Styled Earl of Offaly (1765-66) and Marquis of Kildare (1766-73); 3rd Duke of Leinster (succeeded 19 Nov. 1773; sworn in House of Lords 18 June 1776) |
[0745] |
|
Fitzgerald (Villiers), John Active in Session(s): 1709, 1710 5th Viscount Grandison (succeeded 16 Dec. 1699; sworn in House of Lords 1 July 1707); 1st Earl Grandison (created 11 Sept. 1721; sworn in House of Lords 14 Sept. 1721) |
[4027] |
|
Fitzgibbon, John Active in Session(s): 1773 |
[0748] |
|
Fitzgibbon, John Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1788, 1789, 1793, 1795, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 Attorney General (20 Dec. 1783 to 11 Aug. 1789); Lord Chancellor (20 June 1789 to d. 28 Jan. 1802) |
[0749] |
|
Fitzherbert, Alleyne Active in Session(s): 1788 Chief Secretary (6 Nov. 1787 to 5 Apr. 1789) |
[0750] |
|
Fitzherbert, William Active in Session(s): 1733 |
[0751] |
|
Fitzmaurice, William Active in Session(s): 1695 |
[0755] |
|
Fitzwilliam, Richard Active in Session(s): 1751 6th Viscount Fitzwilliam of Merrion (succeeded 6 June 1743; sworn in House of Lords 23 Oct. 1751) |
[4024] |
|
Flood, –'Mr Flood' Active in Session(s): 1765 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0762 0763 |
[6046] |
|
Flood, –'Mr Flood' Active in Session(s): 1767 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0762 0764 |
[6047] |
|
Flood, Frederick Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779, 1781 |
[0761] |
|
Flood, Henry Active in Session(s): 1761, 1767, 1773, 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785 |
[0762] |
|
Flood, Jocelyn |
[0763] |
|
Flood, John |
[0764] |
|
Flood, Warden Active in Session(s): 1731, 1739, 1745, 1757 Solicitor General (15 Jan. 1742 to 2 Oct. 1751); Attorney General (2 Oct. 1751 to 26 Aug. 1760) |
[0765] |
|
Flood, Warden Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1775, 1785 |
[0766] |
|
Flower, William Active in Session(s): 1727, 1731, 1739 1st Baron Castle Durrow (created 27 Oct. 1733; sworn in House of Lords 2 Nov. 1733) |
[0767] |
|
Folliott, –'Mr Folliot' Active in Session(s): 1731, 1733 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0771 0772 |
[6049] |
|
Folliott, John Active in Session(s): 1727, 1729 |
[0771] |
|
Folliott, John |
[0772] |
|
Folliott, John'Mr John Folliot' Active in Session(s): 1733 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0771 0772 |
[6048] |
|
Forbes, John Active in Session(s): 1779, 1781, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1788, 1789, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1794, 1795 |
[0778] |
|
Forster, John'Mr Forster, Mr Foster' Active in Session(s): 1703, 1709 Recorder of Dublin (1701 to 1714) |
[0785] |
|
Fortescue, –'Mr Fortescue' Active in Session(s): 1745 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0793 0798 |
[6127] |
|
Fortescue, James Active in Session(s): 1763, 1765, 1767, 1771A, 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1777, 1779, 1781 |
[0792] |
|
Fortescue, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1731 |
[0793] |
|
Fortescue, William Charles Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0797] |
|
Fortescue, William Henry Active in Session(s): 1757 |
[0798] |
|
Forth, James Active in Session(s): 1713, 1715, 1717, 1719 |
[0799] |
|
Foster, –'Mr Foster' Active in Session(s): 1761 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0804 0805 |
[6050] |
|
Foster, –'Mr Foster' Active in Session(s): 1777 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0805 0807 |
[6051] |
|
Foster, –'Mr Foster' Active in Session(s): 1783 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0807 0808 |
[6052] |
|
Foster, –'Mr Foster' This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0805 0809 |
[6138] |
|
Foster, –'Hon. Mr Foster' This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 0805 0809 |
[6139] |
|
Foster, Anthony Active in Session(s): 1745, 1747, 1749, 1751, 1753, 1759, 1761, 1763, 1765 |
[0804] |
|
Foster, John Active in Session(s): 1767, 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1786 Chancellor of the Exchequer (23 Apr. 1784 to 15 Aug. 1785) |
[0805] |
|
Foster, John Thomas Active in Session(s): 1783 |
[0807] |
|
Foster, John William Active in Session(s): 1787, 1788, 1789 |
[0808] |
|
Foster (Skeffington), Thomas Henry Active in Session(s): 1793, 1795 |
[0809] |
|
Foulke (alias Foulkes), Robert Active in Session(s): 1692 |
[0810] |
|
Fownes, William Active in Session(s): 1710, 1711 |
[0811] |
|
Fownes, William Active in Session(s): 1749 |
[0812] |
|
Fox, Luke Active in Session(s): 1795 |
[0814] |
|
French, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[0828] |
|
French, Humphrey Active in Session(s): 1733, 1735 |
[0829] |
|
French, Robert Active in Session(s): 1737, 1739, 1741, 1743 |
[0833] |
|
French, Robert Active in Session(s): 1755, 1757, 1759, 1763, 1765, 1767, 1769, 1771A, 1771B, 1773, 1775 |
[0834] |
|
|