Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Naas, (Styled 1792-1794) Lord (Bourke, John) |
[0194] |
|
Neave, William Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697, 1698, 1703, 1705, 1707, 1709, 1710 Prime Serjeant (1 Dec. 1708 to 10 Aug. 1711) |
[1516] |
|
Nevill, Richard Active in Session(s): 1775, 1777, 1779, 1786, 1789, 1790A, 1793, 1794, 1799 |
[1527] |
|
Newenham, Edward Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1773, 1775, 1777, 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1793 |
[1535] |
|
Newtown-Butler, (Styled 1756-68) Lord (Butler, Brinsley) |
[0313] |
|
Newtown-Butler, 1st Baron (Butler, Theophilus) |
[0329] |
|
Nicolson, William Active in Session(s): 1723 Bishop of Derry (2 May 1718 to 28 Jan. 1727) |
[3017] |
|
No leave recorded, –'The Judges' Active in Session(s): 1733, 1735, 1737, 1739, 1745, 1747, 1749, 1751, 1755, 1759, 1761, 1763, 1765, 1767, 1771A, 1771B, 17 |
[7000] |
|
No member named (as presenting), – |
[7004] |
|
No member named (at leave stage), – Leave given to an existing committee, rather than to named members. |
[7001] |
|
Norman, Charles Active in Session(s): 1721 |
[1543] |
|
Nugent, George Frederick Active in Session(s): 1783, 1785, 1786, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1796B, 1798, 1800 Styled Lord Delvin (1761 to 1791); 7th Earl of Westmeath (succeeded 7 Sept. 1792) |
[1547] |
|
Nutley, Richard Active in Session(s): 1705, 1711 |
[1551] |
|
|