Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Radcliffe, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1775 |
[1755] |
|
Ram, –'Mr Ram' Active in Session(s): 1725 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1756 1763 |
[6086] |
|
Ram, Abel Active in Session(s): 1703, 1709, 1710, 1717 |
[1756] |
|
Ram, Stephen |
[1763] |
|
Ram, Stephen Active in Session(s): 1767, 1773 |
[1764] |
|
Rawdon, John Active in Session(s): 1755 Baron Rawdon of Moira (created 9 Apr. 1750; sworn in House of Lords 10 Apr. 1750); 1st Earl of Moira (created 30 Jan. 1762; sworn in House of Lords 9 Feb. 1762) |
[4051] |
|
Rawson, George Active in Session(s): 1791 |
[1768] |
|
Reading, John Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697 |
[1772] |
|
Reilly, John Active in Session(s): 1793 |
[1773] |
|
Ricasey (alias Richasies or Rickasey), Charles Active in Session(s): 1705 |
[1778] |
|
Richardson, William Active in Session(s): 1698 |
[1784] |
|
Richardson, William Active in Session(s): 1757 |
[1786] |
|
Rigby, Richard Active in Session(s): 1759 Chief Secretary (3 Jan. 1757 to 2 Apr. 1761) |
[1789] |
|
Robinson, Richard Active in Session(s): 1767, 1771B, 1773 Archbishop of Armagh (8 Feb. 1765 to 10 Oct. 1794) |
[3004] |
|
Rochfort, –'Hon. Mr Rochfort' Active in Session(s): 1771B This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1800 1805 1808 |
[6087] |
|
Rochfort, George |
[1800] |
|
Rochfort, John Active in Session(s): 1733, 1753, 1757 |
[1803] |
|
Rochfort, John Staunton Active in Session(s): 1796A, 1796B, 1799 |
[1804] |
|
Rochfort, Robert Active in Session(s): 1703, 1705 Attorney General (6 June 1695 to 29 June 1707) |
[1806] |
|
Rochfort, Robert Active in Session(s): 1773 |
[1808] |
|
Rochfort (Rochfort-Mervyn), Richard |
[1805] |
|
Rogers, George Active in Session(s): 1698 |
[1809] |
|
Rogerson, John Active in Session(s): 1698 |
[1811] |
|
Rogerson, John Active in Session(s): 1715, 1717, 1719, 1721, 1725, 1727, 1729, 1733, 1735, 1737 Recorder of Dublin (1714 ?to death); Solicitor General (3 Dec. 1714 to 22 May 1720); Attorney General (23 May 1720 to 3 May 1727) |
[1812] |
|
Rose, Henry Active in Session(s): 1717, 1719, 1721, 1723, 1725, 1731, 1733 |
[1813] |
|
Ross, Robert Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1775, 1777, 1779, 1781, 1796B |
[1816] |
|
Rowley, Clotworthy Active in Session(s): 1775, 1785 |
[1818] |
|
Rowley, Hercules Active in Session(s): 1723, 1735 |
[1819] |
|
Rowley, Hercules Langford Active in Session(s): 1745, 1755, 1757, 1759, 1763, 1785, 1790A |
[1821] |
|
Rowley, William Active in Session(s): 1793 |
[1825] |
|
Rugge, Henry Active in Session(s): 1725 |
[1826] |
|
Ryder, John Active in Session(s): 1749, 1751 Bishop of Down and Connor (1 Aug. 1743 to 19 Mar. 1752) |
[3020] |
|
|