Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Sandford, Henry Active in Session(s): 1710, 1713, 1715, 1717, 1719, 1729 |
[1867] |
|
Sandford, Henry Active in Session(s): 1767 |
[1868] |
|
Saunders, Anderson Active in Session(s): 1697, 1698, 1703, 1705, 1710, 1713 |
[1878] |
|
Saunders, Morley Active in Session(s): 1703, 1705, 1711, 1713 Prime Serjeant (9 Feb. 1713 to 7 Dec. 1714) |
[1880] |
|
Saunderson (alias Sanderson), Francis Active in Session(s): 1796A |
[1883] |
|
Savage, Philip Active in Session(s): 1692, 1695, 1697, 1698, 1703, 1705, 1707 Chancellor of Exchequer (13 Sept. 1695 to 7 Aug. 1717) |
[1889] |
|
Scott, John Active in Session(s): 1773, 1775, 1777, 1779, 1781 Solicitor General (15 Dec. 1774 to 1 Nov. 1777); Attorney General (1 Nov. 1777 to 11 July 1782) |
[1891] |
|
Seymour-Conway (Ingram-Seymour-Conway), Francis Active in Session(s): 1765 Styled Viscount Beauchamp (1750 to 1793) |
[1896] |
|
Shaw, Robert Active in Session(s): 1715, 1717, 1719, 1725 |
[1905] |
|
Sheares, Henry Active in Session(s): 1763, 1765 |
[1909] |
|
Shee, George Active in Session(s): 1798, 1799, 1800 |
[1910] |
|
Sheil, James Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1773, 1775 |
[1911] |
|
Sheppard, Anthony Active in Session(s): 1733, 1735 |
[1913] |
|
Sheridan, Charles Francis Active in Session(s): 1777, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1788, 1789 |
[1914] |
|
Silver, John Active in Session(s): 1711 |
[1921] |
|
Singleton, Edward Active in Session(s): 1697, 1698, 1703, 1705, 1709 |
[1922] |
|
Singleton, Henry Active in Session(s): 1723, 1725, 1729 Prime Serjeant (22 June 1726 to 13 Jan. 1742) |
[1924] |
|
Singleton (Fowke), Sydenham Active in Session(s): 1777 |
[1926] |
|
Skeffington, –'Mr Skeffington' Active in Session(s): 1795, 1796A This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1928 1931 1935 |
[6088] |
|
Skeffington, Chichester |
[1928] |
|
Skeffington, Clotworthy Active in Session(s): 1703, 1707, 1709 3rd Viscount Massereene (succeeded 21 June 1695; sworn in House of Lords 27 Aug. 1695) |
[1929] |
|
Skeffington, Clotworthy Active in Session(s): 1737, 1745, 1747, 1749, 1751, 1755 5th Viscount Massareene (succeeded 11 Feb. 1739; sworn in House of Lords 9 Oct. 1739); 1st Earl of Massereene (created 28 July 1756) |
[4037] |
|
Skeffington, Henry |
[1931] |
|
Skeffington, William John Active in Session(s): 1771B, 1773, 1785, 1795, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1800 |
[1935] |
|
Slattery, Joseph Active in Session(s): 1725 |
[1936] |
|
Sloane, James Active in Session(s): 1695 |
[1937] |
|
Smith (Cusack-Smith), William Active in Session(s): 1796B |
[1943] |
|
Smyth, Charles Active in Session(s): 1739, 1745, 1757, 1771B, 1773, 1775 |
[1945] |
|
Smyth, Edward Active in Session(s): 1703, 1705, 1709, 1710 Bishop of Down and Connor (2 Apr. 1699 to 16 Oct. 1720) |
[3019] |
|
Smyth, George Active in Session(s): 1759 |
[1947] |
|
Smyth, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1703 Bishop of Limerick (8 Dec. 1695 to 4 May 1725) |
[3025] |
|
Smythe, Philip Active in Session(s): 1739, 1761 4th Viscount Strangford (succeeded 8 Sept. 1724) |
[4055] |
|
Solicitor General
• |
6 June 1695 to 14 Apr. 1704 |
Alan Brodrick |
[0237] |
• |
15 Apr. 1704 to 7 Sept. 1709 |
Sir Richard Levinge |
[1230] |
• |
3 Dec. 1714 to 22 May 1720 |
John Rogerson |
[1812] |
• |
26 Dec. 1720 to 3 May 1727 |
Thomas Marlay |
[1344] |
• |
4 May 1727 to 22 Oct. 1730 |
Robert Jocelyn |
[1098] |
• |
15 Jan. 1742 to 2 Oct. 1751 |
Warden Flood |
[0765] |
• |
27 Aug. 1760 to 23 Sept. 1764 |
John Gore |
[0869] |
• |
24 Sept. 1764 to 3 July 1770 |
Marcus Paterson |
[1640] |
• |
4 July 1770 to 14 Dec. 1774 |
Godfrey Lill |
[1236] |
• |
15 Dec. 1774 to 1 Nov. 1777 |
John Scott |
[1891] |
• |
2 Nov. 1777 to 3 May 1779 |
Robert Hellen |
[0998] |
• |
4 May 1779 to 9 May 1787 |
Hugh Carleton |
[0353] |
• |
10 May 1787 to 11 Aug. 1789 |
Arthur Wolfe |
[2243] |
• |
12 Aug. 1789 to 9 July 1798 |
John Toler |
[2081] |
• |
16 July 1798 to 23 Dec. 1800 |
John Stewart |
[2006] |
|
|
|
Somerville, James Active in Session(s): 1777 |
[1958] |
|
Southwell, – Active in Session(s): 1745 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1963 1965 |
[6129] |
|
Southwell, Edward |
[1963] |
|
Southwell, Henry |
[1965] |
|
Southwell, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1703, 1705, 1707 |
[1968] |
|
Southwell, Thomas George Active in Session(s): 1771B 3rd Baron Southwell of Castle Mattress (succeeded 19 or 20 Nov. 1766); 1st Viscount Southwell of Castle Mattress (created 18 July 1776) |
[1971] |
|
St George, Oliver Active in Session(s): 1709 |
[1843] |
|
St George, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1777, 1779 |
[1850] |
|
St Leger, Arthur Active in Session(s): 1723, 1725 |
[1853] |
|
Stafford (Echlin), Edmond Francis Active in Session(s): 1698, 1710 |
[1977] |
|
Stanley, Edmund Active in Session(s): 1791, 1795, 1800 |
[1978] |
|
Stannard, Eaton Active in Session(s): 1731 |
[1981] |
|
Stannus, William Active in Session(s): 1725 |
[1984] |
|
Staples, John Active in Session(s): 1794 |
[1985] |
|
Staunton, John Active in Session(s): 1705, 1729 |
[1988] |
|
Staunton, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1743 |
[1990] |
|
Stearne, John Active in Session(s): 1723 Bishop of Clogher (30 Mar. 1717 to 6 June 1745) |
[3015] |
|
Stevenson, –'Mr Stevenson' Active in Session(s): 1731 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 1996 1997 |
[6090] |
|
Stevenson, James |
[1996] |
|
Stevenson, James |
[1997] |
|
Stewart, Annesley Active in Session(s): 1779, 1785, 1791 |
[1998] |
|
Stewart, Henry |
[2002] |
|
Stewart, James Active in Session(s): 1777, 1781, 1794, 1796A |
[2004] |
|
Stewart, John Active in Session(s): 1798, 1799, 1800 Solicitor General (16 July 1798 to 23 Dec. 1800) |
[2006] |
|
Stewart, Richard Active in Session(s): 1723 |
[2007] |
|
Stewart, Robert Active in Session(s): 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 Styled Viscount Castlereagh (8 Aug. 1797 to 5 Apr. 1821) |
[2009] |
|
Stewart, William Active in Session(s): 1735, 1741 3rd Viscount Mountjoy (succeeded 10 Jan. 1728; sworn in House of Lords 5 Oct. 1731); Earl of Blessington (created 7 Dec. 1745) |
[4043] |
|
Stewart (alias Steuart), William Active in Session(s): 1711 |
[2011] |
|
Stewart=Steuart, –'Mr Stewart' Active in Session(s): 1798 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2002 2004 2006 |
[6091] |
|
Stone, George Active in Session(s): 1745, 1747, 1749, 1755 Bishop of Derry (11 May 1745 to 13 Mar. 1747); Archbishop of Armagh (13 Mar. 1747 to 19 Dec. 1764) |
[3003] |
|
Stratford, Edward Augustus Active in Session(s): 1763, 1777, 1781, 1783, 1794, 1796A, 1796B 2nd Earl of Aldborough (succeeded 29 June 1777) |
[2024] |
|
Stratford, John Active in Session(s): 1749 |
[2025] |
|
Straton, John Active in Session(s): 1799 |
[2028] |
|
Synge, Edward Active in Session(s): 1717, 1719, 1721, 1723, 1727, 1731 Archbishop of Tuam (8 June 1716 to 23 July 1741) |
[3012] |
|
Synge, Edward Active in Session(s): 1747 Bishop of Elphin (15 May 1740 to 27 Jan. 1762) |
[3036] |
|
Synge, Francis Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[2034] |
|
|