Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
Talbot, William Active in Session(s): 1773, 1775 |
[2036] |
|
Taylor (alias Taylour), Thomas Active in Session(s): 1721, 1723, 1729, 1731, 1733 |
[2044] |
|
Taylor (alias Taylour), Thomas Active in Session(s): 1743 |
[2045] |
|
Tenison, Henry Active in Session(s): 1698, 1703, 1705, 1707 |
[2053] |
|
Tenison, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1737, 1749, 1751, 1759 Prime Serjeant (27 July 1759 to 10 Dec. 1761) |
[2055] |
|
Tennison, Edward Active in Session(s): 1731 Bishop of Ossory (4 July 1731 to 29 Nov. 1735) |
[3028] |
|
Tennison, Richard Active in Session(s): 1695, 1697 Bishop of Clogher (28 Feb. 1691 to 25 June 1697); Bishop of Meath (25 June 1697 to 29 July 1705) |
[3014] |
|
Thompson, Richard Active in Session(s): 1705, 1711 |
[2060] |
|
Tichborne, Henry Active in Session(s): 1719 Baron Ferrard of Beaulieu (created 9 Oct. 1715) |
[2061] |
|
Tighe, –'Mr Tighe' Active in Session(s): 1773 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2064 2069 2072 |
[6092] |
|
Tighe, Edward Active in Session(s): 1765, 1771A, 1771B, 1773, 1794 |
[2064] |
|
Tighe, Henry |
[2065] |
|
Tighe, Richard Active in Session(s): 1715, 1717, 1719, 1721, 1723, 1725, 1729 |
[2066] |
|
Tighe, Robert |
[2069] |
|
Tighe, Robert |
[2070] |
|
Tighe, William Active in Session(s): 1739 |
[2071] |
|
Tighe, William Active in Session(s): 1767, 1773, 1800 |
[2072] |
|
Tighe, William Active in Session(s): 1795, 1796B |
[2073] |
|
Tisdall, –'Mr Tisdall' Active in Session(s): 1723 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2076 2077 2079 |
[6094] |
|
Tisdall, James |
[2076] |
|
Tisdall, Michael Active in Session(s): 1713, 1715, 1719, 1721, 1723 |
[2077] |
|
Tisdall, Philip Active in Session(s): 1773 Attorney General (27 Aug. 1760 to 31 Oct. 1777) |
[2078] |
|
Tisdall, Richard |
[2079] |
|
Toler, –'Mr Toler' Active in Session(s): 1783, 1790A This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2080 2081 |
[6095] |
|
Toler, Daniel |
[2080] |
|
Toler, John Active in Session(s): 1785, 1788, 1789, 1790A, 1790B, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A, 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 Third Serjeant (15 Jan. 1784 to 26 June 1784); Second Serjeant (27 June 1784 to 1789); Solicitor General (12 Aug. 1789 to 9 July 1798); Attorney General (10 July 1798 to 22 Dec. 1800) |
[2081] |
|
Tottenham, Charles Active in Session(s): 1795 |
[2089] |
|
Townley-Balfour, William Charles Active in Session(s): 1800 |
[2096] |
|
Townsend, – Active in Session(s): 1798 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2099 2102 |
[6134] |
|
Townsend, John Active in Session(s): 1794, 1796A, 1799 |
[2099] |
|
Townsend, Thomas |
[2102] |
|
Trant, Dominick'Mr Trant' Active in Session(s): 1781 |
[2103] |
|
Trench, –'Mr Trench' Active in Session(s): 1787 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2104 2111 |
[6096] |
|
Trench, – Active in Session(s): 1800 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2104 2106 |
[6097] |
|
Trench, –'Mr Trench' Active in Session(s): 1798 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2104 2110 |
[6130] |
|
Trench, (Michael) Frederick Active in Session(s): 1785, 1787, 1790A |
[2108] |
|
Trench, Charles |
[2104] |
|
Trench, Francis |
[2106] |
|
Trench, Frederick |
[2108a] |
|
Trench, William Power Keating |
[2111] |
|
Trench (Le Poer-Trench), Richard Active in Session(s): 1798, 1799, 1800 |
[2110] |
|
Trevor (Hill-Trevor), Arthur Active in Session(s): 1763 |
[2112] |
|
Trotter, Thomas Active in Session(s): 1719, 1721, 1723, 1725, 1727, 1729, 1743 |
[2115] |
|
Tunnadine, John Active in Session(s): 1777 |
[2116] |
|
Tydd, John Active in Session(s): 1779, 1781, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1787, 1789, 1790A, 1791, 1792, 1793, 1794, 1795, 1796A, 1796B, 1798 |
[2117] |
|
Tynte (Worth), James Active in Session(s): 1719 |
[2118] |
|
Tyrone, (Styled 1789 to 1800) Earl of |
[0014] |
|
Tyrone, 8th Earl of (Beresford, George de la Poer) |
[0113] |
|
|