Acknowledgments Text of legislation How Irish statutes were made Sources for Irish legislation, 1692–1800 General Index of Bills Members of parliament Regnal years and statute numbers Links Contact Us |
Here you can browse a list of names of members of parliament appearing in the Journals in connection with legislation.
The list is organised alphabetically by name. Surnames are given, as well as titles of offices, names of bishoprics and peerage titles by which members were referred to. Some members therefore occur more than once in the list.
Clicking on a member’s 4-digit code (on the right) will display a chronological list of legislative measures he was associated with.
van Reede, Frederik Christiaan Reinhart Active in Session(s): 1796B, 1798, 1799, 1800 4th Earl of Athlone (succeeded 1 Dec. 1747; sworn in House of Lords 10 Mar. 1795) |
[4006] |
|
Vandeleur, –'Mr Vandeleur' Active in Session(s): 1794 This unidentified member is one of the following identified members: 2136 2137 2138 |
[6100] |
|
Vandeleur, John Ormsby Active in Session(s): 1792, 1793, 1794, 1796A, 1796B, 1800 |
[2136] |
|
Vandeleur, John Ormsby |
[2137] |
|
Vandeleur, Thomas Pakenham |
[2138] |
|
Verner, James Active in Session(s): 1795, 1796A, 1800 |
[2142] |
|
Vesey, Agmondisham Active in Session(s): 1709, 1713, 1717, 1719, 1723, 1727, 1729, 1731, 1735 |
[2144] |
|
Vesey, Agmondisham Active in Session(s): 1741, 1765, 1775 |
[2145] |
|
Vesey, John Active in Session(s): 1695, 1698, 1703, 1711, 1713 Archbishop of Tuam (18 Mar. 1679 to 28 Mar. 1716) |
[3011] |
|
Vesey, William Active in Session(s): 1715, 1719, 1723, 1725, 1731 |
[2149] |
|
Vigors, Bartholomew Active in Session(s): 1703 Bishop of Ferns (8 Mar. 1691 to 3 Jan. 1722) |
[3026] |
|
|